ME LD602 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Pollution from Single-use Plastic Straws, Splash Sticks and Beverage Lid Plugs
Title
An Act To Prevent Pollution from Single-use Plastic Straws, Splash Sticks and Beverage Lid Plugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #197 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 197 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-04-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |