ME LD59 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ordered sent down forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Permit Plantations To Fill Vacancies of Town Officials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Permit Plantations To Fill Vacancies of Town Officials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-03-21SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-8), in concurrence.
2019-03-21SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-19SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-8) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-19SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-19SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-8).
2019-03-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-03-14HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-15SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
2019-01-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-15HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2019-01-15HouseCommittee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback