ME LD588 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Promote Public Safety and Retain Essential First Responders by Funding the Maine Length of Service Award Program
Title
An Act to Promote Public Safety and Retain Essential First Responders by Funding the Maine Length of Service Award Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-07-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-07-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED Senate Amendment "A" (S-457). |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-457) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-457) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |