ME LD585 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the Adoption of Ordinances Prohibiting the Accumulation of Trash on Private Property in Plantations
Title
An Act To Allow the Adoption of Ordinances Prohibiting the Accumulation of Trash on Private Property in Plantations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-187), in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-187) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-187). |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |