ME LD580 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Extend the Funding Period for Landfill Closure Costs
Title
An Act To Extend the Funding Period for Landfill Closure Costs
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Andrew Buckland [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] |
Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] | Rep. Dustin White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-16 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115). |
2015-06-16 | House | On further motion of same Representative, Senate Amendment "B" (S-182) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2015-06-16 | House | On further motion of same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "B" (S-182). |
2015-06-16 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-182). |
2015-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative WHITE of Washburn, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-182). |
2015-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-182) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-182) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Senate RECEDED from PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-113) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-113) and INDEFINITELY POSTPONED Same |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2015-06-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-01 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115). |
2015-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-113) READ and ADOPTED PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-113) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President Subsequently, Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report , in concurrence. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Report READ |
2015-05-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-115). |
2015-05-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-115) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-05-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-12 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-07 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2015-05-07 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2015-05-07 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative GIDEON of Freeport REMOVED. |
2015-05-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin, REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |