ME LD576 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Study and Develop an Online Learning Platform for Students and Educators
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Study and Develop an Online Learning Platform for Students and Educators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-125), in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-125) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-125). |
2019-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |