ME LD574 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Maine Food Sovereignty Act and To Recognize the Maine Food Sovereignty Act in Plantations and Unorganized Territories

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Maine Food Sovereignty Act and To Recognize the Maine Food Sovereignty Act in Plantations and Unorganized Territories

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #236 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #144 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2022-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2022-04-13HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-13HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-402) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-543) thereto.
2022-04-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2022-04-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-402) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-543) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2022-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-402) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-543) thereto ADOPTED
2022-04-12SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "C" (S-543) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-402) READ and ADOPTED
2022-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-402) READ
2022-04-12SenateREAD ONCE
2022-04-12SenateOn motion by Same Senator The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2022-04-12SenateOn motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Senate RECEDED from Acceptance of the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report
2022-04-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2022-04-11SenateUnfinished Business
2022-04-07SenateUnfinished Business
2022-04-05SenateUnfinished Business
2022-03-31SenateUnfinished Business
2022-03-29SenateUnfinished Business
2022-03-24SenateUnfinished Business
2022-03-22SenateUnfinished Business
2022-03-09SenateUnfinished Business
2022-02-23SenateUnfinished Business
2022-02-16SenateUnfinished Business
2022-02-10SenateUnfinished Business
2022-01-26SenateUnfinished Business
2022-01-05SenateUnfinished Business
2021-09-29SenateUnfinished Business
2021-07-19SenateCARRIED OVER, IN THE SAME POSTURE, TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 130th LEGISLATURE, PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1302
2021-07-19SenateUnfinished Business
2021-07-02SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-30SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-17SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2021-06-10HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-10HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-402).
2021-06-09SenateRELEASED.
2021-06-08SenateHELD at the Request of Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland.
2021-06-08SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-08SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 236 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-08SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-08SenateReports Read
2021-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-402).
2021-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-402) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 144 (Yeas 92 - Nays 52 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-07HouseReports READ.
2021-06-03JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2021-05-13JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-13JointWork Session Held
2021-05-06JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-05-04JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-04-22JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-02-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-02-22HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=574&snum=130
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0419&item=1&snum=130
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0419&item=10&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0419&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0419&item=9&snum=130
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN057402.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN057409.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN057410.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078963&chamber=House&serialnumber=144
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078963&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=236

Bill Comments

feedback