ME LD566 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Provide Funding for Sexual Assault Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Provide Funding for Sexual Assault Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-05-10SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2024-05-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-779) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2024-05-10SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-779) READ and ADOPTED
2024-05-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56)
2024-05-10SenateOn Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-05-11SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-05-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-56).
2023-05-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-05-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-05-03SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-05-03SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56)
2023-05-03SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2023-05-02SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2023-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-56) READ and ADOPTED
2023-05-02SenateREAD ONCE
2023-05-02SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2023-04-27JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-04-04JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-04-04JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-02-09HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-02-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2023-02-09SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback