ME LD564 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve Access to Civil Legal Services
Title
An Act to Improve Access to Civil Legal Services
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Amy Kuhn [D] |
Rep. Sawin Millett [R] | Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Jennifer Poirier [R] |
Rep. Ambureen Rana [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #41 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #96 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #96 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2023-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-04 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-05-04 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2023-05-04 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-05-02 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-05-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-04-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-30). |
2023-04-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-30) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-04-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 41 (Yeas 80 - Nays 61 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-04-27 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-30) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-30) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 96 Yeas 23 - Nays 7 - Excused 0 - Absent 5 PREVAILED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report was ACCEPTED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |