ME LD564 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Save Money by Eliminating the Requirement That the Annual Reports of State Agencies Be Printed
Title
An Act To Save Money by Eliminating the Requirement That the Annual Reports of State Agencies Be Printed
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Connor [R] | Rep. Amanda Collamore [R] | Rep. John Ducharme [R] | Rep. Michael Lemelin [R] |
Rep. Cathy Nadeau [R] | Rep. Timothy Roche [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-83), in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-83). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021. |