ME LD559 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Restore Regular Mapping of Eelgrass Beds in the State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Restore Regular Mapping of Eelgrass Beds in the State

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-48) in concurrence
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-48) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2019-04-11SenateREAD ONCE
2019-04-11SenateSubsequently Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-04-11SenateTaken from the table by the President Taken from the table by the President ProTem
2019-04-09SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-04SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-48).
2019-04-02HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-02HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2019-02-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-02-05HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback