ME LD550 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the State Board of Education To Adopt Rules Prohibiting Teachers in Public Schools from Engaging in Political, Ideological or Religious Advocacy in the Classroom

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the State Board of Education To Adopt Rules Prohibiting Teachers in Public Schools from Engaging in Political, Ideological or Religious Advocacy in the Classroom

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #238 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #146 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-06-08SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 238 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-08SenateOn motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2021-06-08SenateReports Read
2021-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 146 (Yeas 82 - Nays 63 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2021-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-07HouseReports READ.
2021-06-03JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-12JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-02-22HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-02-22HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback