ME LD545 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Combat the Sexual Exploitation of Minors in Maine
Title
An Act To Combat the Sexual Exploitation of Minors in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. John Andrews [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-702) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-702) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-702). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-702) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021. |