ME LD54 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Limit the Influence of Lobbyists by Expanding the Prohibition on Accepting Political Contributions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Limit the Influence of Lobbyists by Expanding the Prohibition on Accepting Political Contributions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - House - Enactment RC #215 (Y: 88 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Insist RC #186 (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Recede And Concur RC #185 (Y: 70 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-196 To Cas-132 RC #202 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Recede RC #201 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Adopt Sas-150 To Cas-132 RC #147 (Y: 22 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #146 (Y: 84 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Commit To Vla RC #145 (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #144 (Y: 54 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Adopt Sas-150 To Cas-132 RC #144 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HouseROLL CALL NO. 215 (Yeas 88 - Nays 53 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-10HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) in concurrence
2019-06-06HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 186 (Yeas 131 - Nays 9 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseSubsequently, The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132).
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 185 (Yeas 70 - Nays 71 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseMotion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED
2019-06-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2019-06-05SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-196) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-132) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-196) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 202 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-196) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateSubsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
2019-06-05SenateOn further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) thereto
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 201 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator CHENETTE of York The Senate RECEDED From PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) thereto
2019-06-05SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-05-29HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132).
2019-05-29HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) was ADOPTED.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 147 (Yeas 22 - Nays 120 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseSenate Amendment "A" (S-150) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) FAILED ADOPTION.
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-132) was READ.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 146 (Yeas 84 - Nays 58 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 145 (Yeas 59 - Nays 83 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseMotion of Representative STROM of Pittsfield to COMMIT the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS FAILED.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 144 (Yeas 54 - Nays 87 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseMotion of Representative ANDREWS of Paris to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED.
2019-05-29HouseRepresentative SCHNECK of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report
2019-05-29HouseReports READ.
2019-05-28SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) thereto
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-132) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) thereto ADOPTED
2019-05-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 144 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator CHENETTE of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-150) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ
2019-05-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-28SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-28SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-23SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2019-05-23SenateReport READ
2019-01-09HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-01-09SenateCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=54&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0018&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0018&item=2&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0018&item=5&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=144
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=144
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=145
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=146
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=147
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=201
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=202
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=185
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=186
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070713&chamber=House&serialnumber=215

Bill Comments

feedback