ME LD54 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Compensation to a Corrections Officer Injured by a Patient or Prisoner
Title
An Act To Provide Compensation to a Corrections Officer Injured by a Patient or Prisoner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-04-06 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-01-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=54&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0041&item=1&snum=128 |