ME LD54 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise the Law Regarding Vehicle Turning and Signals
Title
An Act To Revise the Law Regarding Vehicle Turning and Signals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 6 (Yeas 73 - Nays 72 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Representative CEBRA of Naples moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-01-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=54&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0047&item=1&snum=125 |