ME LD54 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Change the Coyote Night Hunting Season
Title
An Act To Change the Coyote Night Hunting Season
Sponsors
Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Rep. Howard Mcfadden [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] |
Rep. Dianne Tilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-08 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-29) in concurrence | |
2009-04-08 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-29) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-07 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-29) | |
2009-04-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Bryant of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-07 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-01-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |