ME LD539 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Ensure Appropriate Personal Needs Allowances for Persons Residing in Nursing Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Ensure Appropriate Personal Needs Allowances for Persons Residing in Nursing Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-07SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-04-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-04-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-131), in concurrence.
2019-04-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-131) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-30SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-30SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-25HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-131).
2019-04-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-31SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2019-01-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-31HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-01-31HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback