ME LD537 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Design and Implement a Demonstration Project on Recertification of Certified Nursing Assistants
Title
Resolve, To Design and Implement a Demonstration Project on Recertification of Certified Nursing Assistants
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Timothy Driscoll [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Rep. Anne Graham [D] |
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Rep. Robert Hunt [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Kerri Prescott [R] |
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. David Webster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) in concurrence | |
2011-05-03 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) | |
2011-04-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Rector of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |