ME LD534 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 325 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 325 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Ballot Questions Easier To Read and Understand for Maine Voters
Title
An Act To Make Ballot Questions Easier To Read and Understand for Maine Voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #325 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 325 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-277), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-277). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |