ME LD526 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the Cap on an Increase in the State Share of the Cost of Health Insurance for Retired Teachers
Title
An Act To Remove the Cap on an Increase in the State Share of the Cost of Health Insurance for Retired Teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #200 (Y: 76 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'c' Otp-a By 'b' RC #168 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #40 (Y: 79 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'c' Otp-a By 'b' RC #168 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #40 (Y: 79 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 200 (Yeas 76 - Nays 60 - Absent 14 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2017-05-31 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of REPORT C Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-41) thereto. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-41) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-41) thereto was ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-41) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) READ |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 168 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Subsequently Report C Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Report C Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-42) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Report C Ought to Pass as Amended Report in non-concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-41). |
2017-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 40 (Yeas 79 - Nays 57 - Absent 14 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |