ME LD524 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Research Workable Methods To Collect Pesticide Sales and Use Records for the Purpose of Providing Information to the Public
Title
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Research Workable Methods To Collect Pesticide Sales and Use Records for the Purpose of Providing Information to the Public
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-181). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |