ME LD518 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Burial or Cremation of Certain Persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Burial or Cremation of Certain Persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-45).
2017-05-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-05-02SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-45)
2017-05-02SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2017-04-27SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2017-04-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-45) READ and ADOPTED
2017-04-27SenateREAD ONCE
2017-04-27SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2017-02-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-02-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-02-14SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-02-14SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback