ME LD517 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Principles of Reimbursement for Residential Care Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Principles of Reimbursement for Residential Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #453 (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #414 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02HouseOrdered Sent Forthwith.
2017-08-02HouseIn concurrence. Sent to the Engrossing Department.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 453V 124 having voted in the affirmative and 13 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-08-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 517 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-91) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-321) thereto.
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-91) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-321) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-91) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-321) thereto ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-321) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-91) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (S-91)
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-05-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-25HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-23HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-23HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-91)
2017-05-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-91) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-23HouseSubsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-23HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-05-18HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-17HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-17HouseLater today assigned.
2017-05-17HouseOn motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
2017-05-17HouseThe Committee Report was READ.
2017-05-17HouseOn OBJECTION of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester REMOVED.
2017-05-17HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-05-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-91)
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-91) READ and ADOPTED
2017-05-16SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2017-02-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-02-14SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback