ME LD516 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Review Career and Technical Education Courses and Provide Guidance on High School Credit Equivalencies
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Review Career and Technical Education Courses and Provide Guidance on High School Credit Equivalencies
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Timothy Roche [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Rep. Bruce White [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-17 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-17 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 17, 2021. |