ME LD514 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish and Promote a System of Safe Disposal of Expired Marine Flares
Title
An Act To Establish and Promote a System of Safe Disposal of Expired Marine Flares
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Ann Matlack [D] | Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. William Tuell [R] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-389) thereto. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-389) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-389) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-389) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) was ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-539), in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-539). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-17 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 17, 2021. |