ME LD51 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Maine Insurance Data Security Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Maine Insurance Data Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Blier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-02-04 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-01-28 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |