ME LD507 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Employer Recovery of Overcompensation Paid to an Employee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Employer Recovery of Overcompensation Paid to an Employee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-732).
2020-03-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2020-03-12HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-732) was READ and ADOPTED.
2020-03-12HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2020-03-12HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2020-03-12HouseReports READ.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-01-31SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-01-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-01-31HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback