ME LD506 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve the Child and Family Court Process by Increasing the Number and Duties of Family Law Magistrates
Title
An Act to Improve the Child and Family Court Process by Increasing the Number and Duties of Family Law Magistrates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-03-24 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-03-16 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=506&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0223&item=1&snum=131 |