ME LD491 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Give Special Weight to Discriminatory Motive in Sentencing for False Public Alarm or Report
Title
An Act To Give Special Weight to Discriminatory Motive in Sentencing for False Public Alarm or Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-143). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-143). |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |