ME LD487 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Certain Employees of and To Provide for the Payment of Certain Filing Fees to the Public Advocate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Certain Employees of and To Provide for the Payment of Certain Filing Fees to the Public Advocate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-08HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-169).
2021-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-169) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-08HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-08HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-08HouseReports READ.
2021-06-07SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-169)
2021-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-169) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Report A Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendmend "A" (H-169) ACCEPTED.
2021-06-07SenateReports Read
2021-06-03JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-11JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-11JointWork Session Held
2021-05-06JointWork Session Reconsidered: TABLED
2021-04-11JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-08JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback