ME LD485 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Actions of the Owner or Keeper of a Dog That Assaults a Person and Causes an Injury That Requires Medical Attention
Title
An Act Regarding Actions of the Owner or Keeper of a Dog That Assaults a Person and Causes an Injury That Requires Medical Attention
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Donna Doore [D] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] |
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-65). |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-65). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-65) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |