ME LD482 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Title
An Act To Repeal the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'c' Otp-a By Ca"b" RC #199 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Acc Report 'a Ontp RC #177 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Acc Report 'a Ontp RC #177 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report C Ought to Pass As Amended AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-301) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought Not to Pass. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-301) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-301) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Roll Call Number 199 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Subsequently Report C Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT Report C Ought to Pass as Amended in NON-CONCURRENCE. Roll Call Ordered |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Report C Ought to Pass as Amended in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 177 (Yeas 77 - Nays 65 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |