ME LD458 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 97, Private Non-Medical Institution Services, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 97, Private Non-Medical Institution Services, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2017-02-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-02-07 | House | Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072 , reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |