ME LD453 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Regarding Insurance Coverage for Alternative Therapies for Addiction and Recovery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Regarding Insurance Coverage for Alternative Therapies for Addiction and Recovery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #513 (Y: 77 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-03-22HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-353).
2018-03-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-20SenateOn motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report READ and ACCEPTED
2018-03-15HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-15HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2018-03-15HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-353).
2018-03-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-353) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-15HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2018-03-15HouseROLL CALL NO. 513 (Yeas 77 - Nays 59 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
2018-03-15HouseOn motion of Representative LAWRENCE of Eliot, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-15HouseReports READ.
2018-03-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2018-03-06SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2018-03-06SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-27SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-22SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-20SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-15SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-15SenateOn motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2018-02-15SenateReports READ
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-02-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-07HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2017-02-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-02-07SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
2017-02-07SenateCommittee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback