ME LD444 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require Health Insurance Coverage for Specialized Risk Screening for First Responders and Other Public Safety Professionals
Title
An Act to Require Health Insurance Coverage for Specialized Risk Screening for First Responders and Other Public Safety Professionals
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Rep. Sally Cluchey [D] | Rep. Lynn Copeland [D] |
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Cameron Reny [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Report "a" Ought To Pass Am RC #459 (Y: 78 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #649 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #649 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-959) thereto in concurrence |
2024-04-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-959) thereto. |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-959) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-959) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-636). |
2024-04-11 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636). |
2024-04-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2024-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2024-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636). |
2024-04-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 459 (Yeas 78 - Nays 64 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-03 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 649 Yeas 21 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-636) ACCEPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/REF TO LBHS/ONTP |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |