ME LD431 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Make Election Day a State Holiday

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Make Election Day a State Holiday

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #88 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #65 (Y: 74 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-188) in concurrence
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-188) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-09SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-09SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 88 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-09SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-09SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-08SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-05-07SenateSenator CLAXTON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-07SenateReports READ
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-188).
2019-05-02HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-02HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-188) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 65 (Yeas 74 - Nays 69 - Absent 6 - Excused 1 - Vacancy 1)
2019-05-02HouseOn motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-02HouseReports READ.
2019-01-29SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
2019-01-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-29HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2019-01-29HouseCommittee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback