ME LD431 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Work Permit Process for Minors and To Conform the Laws Governing Allowable Places of Work for Minors to Federal Law
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Work Permit Process for Minors and To Conform the Laws Governing Allowable Places of Work for Minors to Federal Law
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. Paul Bennett [R] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] |
Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #182 (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #123 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #123 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 182 (Yeas 83 - Nays 59 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-03 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-31 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-31 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-05-31 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-05-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-05-30 | Senate | (19 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Number 123 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |