ME LD429 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Health of Students and Educators by Requiring School Emergency Management Plans To Address Health and Safety
Title
An Act To Protect the Health of Students and Educators by Requiring School Emergency Management Plans To Address Health and Safety
Sponsors
Rep. David McCrea [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] |
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-366). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-09 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 9, 2021. |