ME LD428 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Failed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Failed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to Article X of the Constitution of Maine Regarding the Publication of Maine Indian Treaty Obligations
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to Article X of the Constitution of Maine Regarding the Publication of Maine Indian Treaty Obligations
Sponsors
Rep. Henry John Bear [I] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] | Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #294 (Y: 73 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-14 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432). |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432). |
2017-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |