ME LD420 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Exclusion Amount in the Estate Tax
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Exclusion Amount in the Estate Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Commit RC #357 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Recede And Concur RC #324 (Y: 85 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #346 (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #278 (Y: 70 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Recede And Concur RC #324 (Y: 85 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #346 (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #278 (Y: 70 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 324 (Yeas 85 - Nays 50 - Absent 15 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-20 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 357 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Taxation In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending RECONSIDERATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 346 Yeas 12 - Nays 19 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | Subsequently, On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 278 (Yeas 70 - Nays 75 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-17 | House | Motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono to accept the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2019-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |