ME LD418 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Graduated Real Estate Transfer Tax
Title
An Act To Create a Graduated Real Estate Transfer Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Williams [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] |
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. Amy Roeder [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #394 (Y: 65 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #406 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Enactment RC #193 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #245 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #158 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #406 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Enactment RC #193 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #245 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #158 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 394V 65 having voted in the affirmative and 77 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 406 Yeas 15 - Nays 19 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED FAILED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 193 (Yeas 79 - Nays 62 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-373) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-373) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 245 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-373). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-373) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 158 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |