ME LD411 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Health Care Practitioner Licensing, Disciplinary and Reporting Laws Regarding Alcohol and Drug Abuse

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Health Care Practitioner Licensing, Disciplinary and Reporting Laws Regarding Alcohol and Drug Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2013-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-05-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2013-04-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2013-04-30SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-84), in concurrence.
2013-04-30SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2013-04-25SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2013-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-84) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2013-04-25SenateREAD ONCE.
2013-04-25SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2013-04-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-04-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-84).
2013-04-24HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2013-04-24HouseCommittee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
2013-04-23HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2013-02-12SenateOn motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence.
2013-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2013-02-12HouseCommittee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback