ME LD404 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, to Direct the Department of Transportation to Implement the Recommendations of the Mountain Division Rail Use Advisory Council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, to Direct the Department of Transportation to Implement the Recommendations of the Mountain Division Rail Use Advisory Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought To Pass As Amended "b" (s-347) Report RC #415 (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22SenateFINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
2023-06-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-22HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2023-06-22HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-22HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-346).
2023-06-22HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-06-22HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-346) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-22HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2023-06-22HouseOn motion of Representative WILLIAMS of Bar Harbor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-22HouseReports READ.
2023-06-21SenateSent down for concurrence
2023-06-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-346)
2023-06-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-346) READ and ADOPTED
2023-06-21SenateREAD ONCE
2023-06-21SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-346) Report ACCEPTED
2023-06-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 415 Yeas 7 - Nays 27 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED
2023-06-21SenateSenator CHIPMAN of Cumberland moved to Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-347) Report
2023-06-21SenateReports READ
2023-06-16JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
2023-05-24JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-05-24JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-02-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-02-02HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
2023-02-02SenateCommittee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback