ME LD404 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund the School Revolving Renovation Fund
Title
An Act To Fund the School Revolving Renovation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #24 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #11 (Y: 85 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #11 (Y: 85 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-9), in concurrence. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-9) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 24 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-9). |
2019-03-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-9) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 11 (Yeas 85 - Nays 49 - Absent 15 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-03-14 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |