ME LD399 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Labor and Housing when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Labor and Housing when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Retirement Benefits under the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Title
An Act To Clarify Retirement Benefits under the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Labor and Housing when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=399&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0283&item=1&snum=130 |