ME LD398 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow for Greater Flexibility in Addressing Energy Efficiency Needs in the State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow for Greater Flexibility in Addressing Energy Efficiency Needs in the State

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-04-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-73), in concurrence.
2019-04-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-73) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-73).
2019-04-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-11HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-29SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-01-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-29HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-01-29HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback