ME LD36 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Deauthorize the Naming of the Bridge over Pattagumpus Stream
Title
Resolve, To Deauthorize the Naming of the Bridge over Pattagumpus Stream
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2011-02-10 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-02-08 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-03 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-06 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |