ME LD353 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Medical Marijuana Cooperatives
Title
An Act To Establish Medical Marijuana Cooperatives
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. Chad Grignon [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-04 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=353&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0251&item=1&snum=130 |