ME LD350 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Certain Requirements Concerning the Sale and Purchase of Firearms
Title
An Act To Repeal Certain Requirements Concerning the Sale and Purchase of Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-137) in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-137) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-137). |
2017-05-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |